Ty Cobb League 4-3-2084 |
|
Nig Phillips | Relief Pitcher Retired (1979, Age 34) |
---|
CAREER | BIOGRAPHICAL DATA | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ERA | 5.47 | Total Rating | Bats/Throws | R/R | ||
W-L | 27-45 | Status | Deceased (2015) | Option Years | 0 | |
SV | 107 | Age at Death | 70 | Date of Birth | 06-18-1945 | |
K | 315 | Drafted | Round 1, Pick 5 (1969) |
Majors Svc Time | 8 years (77 games) |
|
IP | 512.0 | |||||
WHIP | 1.56 |
* League requires 50% rating to start at catcher.
- Stats
- Opp Batting
- L/R Splits
- H/A Splits
- Playoffs
- Energy
- Improvements
- Past Skills
- Awards
- Batting
- Fielding
- Game Log
Year | Team | W | L | G | GS | CG | SHO | SV | BS | IP | H | R | ER | HBP | BB | SO | WHIP | ERA | Awards |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1969 | CIN | 3 |
8 | 69 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
7 |
0 | 83.2 |
99 | 57 | 55 | 3 | 27 | 48 |
1.51 |
5.92
|
|
1970 | CIN-WAS | 2 |
2 | 53 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 | 90.2 |
115 | 74 | 70 | 3 | 39 | 47 |
1.70 |
6.95
|
|
1971 | WAS | 6 |
8 | 88 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
27 |
0 | 82.2 |
94 | 37 | 36 | 3 | 29 | 48 |
1.49 |
3.92
|
|
1972 | WAS | 2 |
9 | 72 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
40 |
0 | 70.0 |
80 | 42 | 38 | 0 | 34 | 53 |
1.63 |
4.89
|
|
1973 | WAS | 5 |
11 | 80 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
25 |
0 | 80.2 |
100 | 60 | 56 | 2 | 27 | 45 |
1.57 |
6.25
|
|
1974 | WAS | 2 |
1 | 17 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 | 20.0 |
19 | 7 | 7 | 0 | 8 | 12 |
1.35 |
3.15
|
|
1976 | WAS | 1 |
2 | 14 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 | 20.0 |
20 | 12 | 12 | 0 | 5 | 19 |
1.25 |
5.40
|
|
1977 | WAS | 5 |
4 | 41 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
4 |
4 | 55.2 |
65 | 34 | 34 | 0 | 21 | 35 |
1.54 |
5.50
|
|
1978 | WAS | 0 |
0 | 4 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
1 |
1 | 3.2 |
5 | 1 | 1 | 0 | 2 | 2 |
1.91 |
2.45
|
|
1979 | WAS | 1 |
0 | 4 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
3 |
0 | 5.0 |
7 | 2 | 2 | 0 | 1 | 6 |
1.60 |
3.60
|
|
2084 | 0 |
0 | 0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 | 0.0 |
0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
0.00 |
0.00
|
||
Total | 27 |
45 | 442 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
107 |
5 | 512.0 |
604 | 326 | 311 | 11 | 193 | 315 |
1.56 |
5.47
|
Date | Transaction |
1979-11-01 | Nig Phillips has retired from the Washington War Dogs |
1976-03-01 | The Washington War Dogs have promoted Jason Slade to the major league team. The Washington War Dogs have promoted Nig Phillips to the major league team. The Washington War Dogs have sent Rodney Cox to the minors. The Washington War Dogs have sent Larry McGee to the minors. |
1974-10-03 | The Washington War Dogs have sent Nig Phillips to the minors. The Washington War Dogs have sent Larry McGee to the minors. |
1974-09-02 | The Washington War Dogs have promoted Nig Phillips to the major league team. |
1974-04-01 | The Washington War Dogs have promoted Freddy Cleveland to the major league team. The Washington War Dogs have sent Nig Phillips to the minors. |
1970-08-08 | The Washington War Dogs have promoted Nig Phillips to the major league team. |
1970-07-23 | The Washington War Dogs have sent Nig Phillips to the minors. |
1970-05-18 | The Washington War Dogs have promoted Nig Phillips to the major league team. The Washington War Dogs have promoted Jerry Curtis to the major league team. The Washington War Dogs have designated Kevin Watson for assignment. The Washington War Dogs have designated Matt Farber for assignment. |
1970-05-18 | A trade has been completed between the Washington War Dogs and the Cincinnati Reds. The Cincinnati Reds receive Roy Roskos, Huey Cash, Dax Cruz from the Washington War Dogs in exchange for Nig Phillips. |
1970-04-09 | The Cincinnati Reds have demoted Nig Phillips to the minor leagues. |
1969-04-29 | The Cincinnati Reds have promoted Eddie Cunningham to the major league team. The Cincinnati Reds have promoted Nig Phillips to the major league team. The Cincinnati Reds have designated Roy Wallace for assignment. The Cincinnati Reds have designated Tony McIlveen for assignment. |
1969-04-25 | The Cincinnati Reds have demoted Nig Phillips to the minor leagues. |
1969-04-19 | The Cincinnati Reds have promoted Nig Phillips to the major league team. |