Ron Santo League 4-1-2316 |
|
Chris Gehrig | Starting Pitcher Retired (1978, Age 37) |
---|
CAREER | BIOGRAPHICAL DATA | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ERA | 4.31 | Total Rating | Bats/Throws | R/R | ||
W-L | 213-172 | Status | Deceased (2023) | Option Years | 0 | |
SV | 33 | Age at Death | 82 | Date of Birth | 06-19-1941 | |
K | 2511 | Drafted | Round 1, Pick 16 (1959) |
Majors Svc Time | 17 years (11 games) |
|
IP | 3371.2 | |||||
WHIP | 1.38 |
* League requires 50% rating to start at catcher.
- Stats
- Opp Batting
- L/R Splits
- H/A Splits
- Playoffs
- Energy
- Improvements
- Past Skills
- Awards
- Batting
- Fielding
- Game Log
Year | Team | W | L | G | GS | CG | SHO | SV | BS | IP | H | R | ER | HBP | BB | SO | WHIP | ERA | Awards |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1962 | NYN-CLE | 9 |
6 | 28 |
28 |
2 |
1 |
0 |
0 | 168.0 |
203 | 111 | 107 | 9 | 78 | 128 |
1.67 |
5.73
|
|
1963 | CLE | 4 |
20 | 34 |
34 |
1 |
0 |
0 |
0 | 202.0 |
237 | 135 | 123 | 3 | 93 | 160 |
1.63 |
5.48
|
|
1964 | CLE | 9 |
16 | 34 |
34 |
1 |
1 |
0 |
0 | 193.2 |
201 | 121 | 112 | 6 | 86 | 144 |
1.48 |
5.20
|
|
1965 | CLE | 13 |
10 | 34 |
34 |
4 |
0 |
0 |
0 | 220.0 |
225 | 114 | 110 | 8 | 74 | 163 |
1.36 |
4.50
|
|
1966 | CLE | 13 |
12 | 34 |
34 |
5 |
2 |
0 |
0 | 211.1 |
209 | 122 | 111 | 6 | 80 | 162 |
1.37 |
4.73
|
|
1967 | CLE | 15 |
13 | 33 |
33 |
6 |
0 |
0 |
0 | 229.2 |
219 | 93 | 87 | 3 | 81 | 166 |
1.31 |
3.41
|
|
1968 | CLE-CHA | 12 |
10 | 34 |
34 |
5 |
1 |
0 |
0 | 227.0 |
219 | 121 | 116 | 3 | 87 | 158 |
1.35 |
4.60
|
|
1969 | CHA | 19 |
13 | 34 |
34 |
10 |
3 |
0 |
0 | 252.1 |
222 | 103 | 94 | 4 | 99 | 190 |
1.27 |
3.35
|
|
1970 | CHA | 17 |
5 | 32 |
32 |
10 |
4 |
0 |
0 | 226.1 |
171 | 93 | 81 | 5 | 87 | 181 |
1.14 |
3.22
|
|
1971 | CHA | 18 |
8 | 30 |
30 |
7 |
1 |
0 |
0 | 221.1 |
192 | 86 | 80 | 4 | 93 | 161 |
1.29 |
3.25
|
|
1972 | CHA | 16 |
7 | 52 |
20 |
2 |
0 |
0 |
0 | 174.0 |
177 | 97 | 90 | 4 | 60 | 117 |
1.36 |
4.66
|
|
1973 | CHA | 17 |
10 | 33 |
33 |
11 |
3 |
0 |
0 | 232.2 |
261 | 121 | 117 | 6 | 85 | 163 |
1.49 |
4.53
|
|
1974 | CHA | 13 |
10 | 32 |
32 |
7 |
1 |
0 |
0 | 228.2 |
225 | 91 | 90 | 1 | 63 | 188 |
1.26 |
3.54
|
|
1975 | CHA | 15 |
9 | 32 |
32 |
4 |
1 |
0 |
0 | 212.1 |
215 | 108 | 103 | 5 | 78 | 164 |
1.38 |
4.37
|
|
1976 | CHA | 8 |
9 | 38 |
22 |
1 |
0 |
0 |
0 | 159.0 |
161 | 83 | 80 | 3 | 47 | 114 |
1.31 |
4.53
|
|
1977 | CHA-STL | 9 |
8 | 26 |
21 |
0 |
0 |
1 |
0 | 135.2 |
138 | 73 | 68 | 3 | 54 | 114 |
1.42 |
4.51
|
|
1978 | STL | 6 |
6 | 60 |
4 |
0 |
0 |
32 |
0 | 78.2 |
79 | 48 | 45 | 4 | 39 | 38 |
1.50 |
5.15
|
|
2316 | 0 |
0 | 0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 | 0.0 |
0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
0.00 |
0.00
|
||
Total | 213 |
172 | 600 |
491 |
76 |
18 |
33 |
0 | 3371.2 |
3354 | 1720 | 1614 | 77 | 1284 | 2511 |
1.38 |
4.31
|
Date | Transaction |
1978-11-01 | Chris Gehrig has retired from the St. Louis Toasted Ravioli |
1977-04-16 | A trade has been completed between the St. Louis Toasted Ravioli and the Chicago Capones. The Chicago Capones receive Ken Buddie, Joel Roof, Draft Pick - 1979 Round 3 (STL), Draft Pick - 1978 Round 4 (STL), Draft Pick - 1980 Round 2 (STL) from the St. Louis Toasted Ravioli in exchange for Oddibe "Bull" Contreras, Newt Schulz, Jim Abernathy, Chris Gehrig. |
1968-05-31 | A trade has been completed between the Chicago Capones and the Cleveland Fighting Turtles. The Cleveland Fighting Turtles receive Newt Schulz, Alex Ross, Cy Harts from the Chicago Capones in exchange for Jack Gura, Bob Cicero, Chris Gehrig. |
1962-08-29 | A trade has been completed between the New York Ghosts of Idols and the Cleveland Highlanders. The Cleveland Highlanders receive Chris Gehrig, Jack Gura, Draft Pick - 1964 Round 1 (NYN) from the New York Ghosts of Idols in exchange for Draft Pick - 1964 Round 1 (CLE), Draft Pick - 1965 Round 1 (CLE), Draft Pick - 1965 Round 2 (CLE), Draft Pick - 1964 Round 2 (CLE). |
1962-04-01 | The New York Ghosts of Idols have promoted Chris Gehrig to the major league team. The New York Ghosts of Idols have promoted Jack Gura to the major league team. The New York Ghosts of Idols have designated Jim Ware for assignment. |